AMI HYDROPOWER FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity sponsors hydropower and water resources management professionals and experts from less developed countries to attend related conferences for the purposes of improving their knowledge and expertise, and more generally, making contacts and gaining knowledge and experience from fellow professionals from both developed and developing countries in this technical field.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 October 2007: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Francois Lemperiere | Trustee | 17 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
BERNHARD PELIKAN | Trustee | 01 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALAN MANCHESTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ERIC JENKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr HARALD KREUZER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR DAVID WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.00k | £765 | £127 | £1.40k | £1.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.23k | £19.04k | £19.82k | £32.64k | £27.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARITABLE TRUST DATED 31 AUGUST 2007
Charitable objects
3.1) THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIME AND IN SUCH MANNER TO, OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF: 3.1.1) THE PUBLIC TO PROMOTE THE ART AND SCIENCE OF HYDRO POWER AND THE RESPONSIBLE USE OF WATER RESOURCES, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, STUDY AND RESEARCH IN HYDRO POWER AND WATER MANAGEMENT; AND 3.1.2) SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 285
37 TELEGRAPH TRACK
WALLINGTON
SURREY
SM6 6AN
- Phone:
- 02087737240
- Email:
- ab@hydropower-dams.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window