JOSEPH MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1121841
Charity reporting is overdue by 126 days
Registration history:
  • 06 December 2007: Standard registration
  • 09 November 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 11 July 2012: Re-registered
  • 09 August 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 12 August 2014: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property