RETAS LEEDS

Charity number: 1121330
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £80.15k £208.97k £320.21k £412.71k £499.05k
Total expenditure £84.35k £136.99k £230.13k £340.12k £458.08k
Income from government contracts £56.96k £164.66k £224.89k £304.47k £374.26k
Income from government grants £0 £10.25k N/A £3.05k £13.78k