SAMYE FOUNDATION WALES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our main purpose is to provide Mindfulness Training to people to help alleviate stress and anxiety and improve mental health and well-being. This training is available to individuals as well as to community groups and organisations. Mindfulness is secular and is open to everyone.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
58 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 02 January 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RASHPAL SINGH | Trustee | 24 July 2014 |
|
|||||
MINU JAGMOHAN MANDORA | Trustee | 24 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANN ROSEMARY DAVIES | Trustee | 24 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
LIEV WINT | Trustee | 24 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ioan Evans | Trustee | 24 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
LAMA YESHE LOSAL RINPOCHE ABBOT | Trustee | 24 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY SAMUEL ALEXANDER HARRIS | Trustee | 24 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.53k | £60.11k | £55.94k | £50.15k | £63.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.91k | £50.20k | £49.58k | £66.91k | £64.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £24.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 AUGUST 2006
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH BY PROMOTING AND DEVELOPING THE USE OF MEDITATION. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR, IN THE TIBETAN CULTURE AND ITS CONTRIBUTION IN PROMOTING TOLERANCE, COMPASSION, RESPECT AND PEACE. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROMOTE SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
250 CARDIFF ROAD EAST
CANTON
CARDIFF
CF5 1GZ
- Phone:
- 02920228040
- Email:
- admin@sfwales.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window