Accounts and annual returns ISLAMIC RESEARCH FOUNDATION INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1122086
Regulatory alert
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2021 30 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 November 2021 On time
Annual return 31 January 2020 30 November 2021 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 November 2021 365 days late
Annual return 31 January 2019 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 31 October 2019 On time
Annual return 31 January 2018 04 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 04 September 2018 On time