PARTNERSHIP OF HOME AND BRINDISHE LEE

Charity number: 1121973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 18 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required