Accounts and annual returns GOLDEN-OLDIES

Charity number: 1121600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 15 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 15 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 25 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 25 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 15 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 15 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 12 August 2019 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 12 August 2019 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 12 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 12 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window