Financial history GOLDEN-OLDIES

Charity number: 1121600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £295.08k £300.65k £412.48k £349.98k £243.86k
Total expenditure £296.42k £293.08k £360.39k £331.60k £281.06k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £23.59k £8.71k £13.47k £9.79k £9.27k