Financial history FRIENDS OF ST HUGH'S - FOSH

Charity number: 1124652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £8.03k £8.32k £10.31k £5.25k £1.07k
Total expenditure £10.46k £10.01k £7.26k £3.71k £447
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A