LOVE IN ACTION (INTERNATIONAL)

Charity number: 1122493
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 March 2020 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 March 2020 32 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 02 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 11 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 11 January 2017 On time Download