FRIENDS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN AUSTRALIA IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND EUROPE

Charity number: 1121961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

UWA Friends through their activities seeks to educate the public by promoting, supporting, assisting and improving the University of Western Australia (or other similar charitable institutions having the same objects), by making grants from Trust Funds.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £65,869
Total expenditure: £66,192

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Westminster
  • Australia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 December 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kristy Elizabeth Duane Trustee 10 October 2023
None on record
Robert John Jewkes Trustee 03 September 2020
None on record
Alexander John Barblett Trustee 04 October 2017
None on record
ROLAND PETER WHITTAKER NATTRASS Trustee 19 June 2012
None on record
CATHERINE Elizabeth HOLMES A COURT MATHER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £51.34k £76.33k £11.56k £59.53k £65.87k
Total expenditure £54.86k £79.55k £5.65k £59.95k £66.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 20 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 17 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
265 Saunders Lane
WOKING
Surrey
GU22 0NU
Phone:
07788973230