ST ALBANS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1122405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 02 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 14 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 20 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 08 July 2016 On time Download