FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S SCHOOL (BLACKBURN)

Charity number: 1122024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 31 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 10 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 31 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 31 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 30 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required