FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S SCHOOL (BLACKBURN)

Charity number: 1122024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £2.47k £2.10k £3.04k £2.88k £4.59k
Total expenditure £1.27k £3.73k £1.61k £3.72k £3.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A