FIRST HAND FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1121063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £12.99k £19.77k £17.15k £12.82k £10.41k
Total expenditure £1.87k £8.63k £4.50k £33.31k £6.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A