MANCHESTER LITERATURE FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1121276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 23 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 10 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 10 January 2017 On time Download