QUEENIE'S CHRISTMAS CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide Christmas Lunch on Christmas Day for up to 500 people who would otherwise spend the day alone. To sponsor the Lord Mayors Christmas Party for 250 underprivileged children at the Town Hall To provide food hampers and gifts to Barnardo's Young Carers To provide a day trip to Blackpool Circus for Barnardo's Young Carers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 26 November 2007: Standard registration
- 05 November 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.52k | £48.71k | £13 | £820 | £38 | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.01k | £45.59k | £6.96k | £3.65k | £1.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 23 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 18 January 2020 | 172 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
3.1.1 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF MONEY, ITEMS OR THE PAYMENT FOR SERVICES AND PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF TRANSPORT, GIFTS AND A MEAL ON CHRISTMAS DAY TO ADULTS LIVING ALONE AND SUFFERING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; 3.1.2 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION OF TRANSPORT FOR OUTINGS, PRESENTS, FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, ITEMS OR THE PAYMENT FOR SERVICES FOR THE SICK OR DISABLED; 3.1.3 MAKING CONTRIBUTIONS OR OTHERWISE ASSISTING THE OBJECTS OF ANY CHARITABLE TRUST, INSTITUTION OR BODY HAVING OBJECTS SIMILAR TO THOSE OF THE CHARITY; AND 3.1.4 ANY OTHER PURPOSES CHARITABLE IN LAW.
Area of benefit
MERSEYSIDE, LANCASHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window