BOREALIS THEATRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1121358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 25 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 28 September 2020 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 28 September 2020 60 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 06 January 2020 160 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 22 August 2018 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 24 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required