TWYNHAM CHURCH FOR THE COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Twynham Church for the Community (Christchurch, Dorset) holds regular services of worship and other regular activities for church members. In addition, the church is involved with work with young families, with children and young people and with older people. Activities includes 'Mums and Toddler' groups, Sunday Schools, Youth Clubs and functions for Senior Citizens.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 26 November 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Preston | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Du Puy | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Brinson | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Dowds | Trustee | 31 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Joy Duffin | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Rutter | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN LESLIE CROCKFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.71k | £172.93k | £175.48k | £151.86k | £163.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.83k | £109.42k | £102.86k | £150.59k | £133.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 November 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 November 2023 | 3 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 AUGUST 2007
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE TO THE ARTICLES HERETO IN CHRISTCHURCH AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND OTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY. B) TO FURTHER CHRISTIAN EDUCATION IN SUCH PARTS OF CHRISTCHURCH, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; C) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
DORSET
Linked charities
- 26 November 2008 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Twynham Church
99 Barrack Road
CHRISTCHURCH
Dorset
BH23 2AL
- Phone:
- 01202604508
- Email:
- davidsims1946@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window