BAUER RADIO'S CASH FOR KIDS CHARITIES

Charity number: 1122062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Danny Simpson Trustee 16 February 2017 None on record
Susan Voss Trustee 14 February 2019 None on record
MARTIN BALL Trustee None on record
David Tighe Trustee 03 June 2020 None on record
SEAN PATRICK MARLEY Trustee None on record
SALLY FIONA AITCHISON Chair None on record
Gary Stein Trustee 23 July 2018 None on record
Sarah Barnes Trustee 23 November 2019 None on record