Financial history THE EYE FUND

Charity number: 1121977
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.80k £18.43k £12.92k £8.31k £9.24k
Total expenditure £3.31k £3.11k £2.40k £9.91k £9.81k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A