Accounts and annual returns WHITE RIBBON CAMPAIGN LTD

Charity number: 1123874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 20 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 13 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 21 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window