Financial history WHITE RIBBON CAMPAIGN LTD

Charity number: 1123874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £246.06k £175.53k £142.64k £111.91k £242.23k
Total expenditure £223.58k £194.63k £189.02k £135.71k £146.44k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £156.43k £75.71k N/A £30.00k £5.24k