ST MICHAEL'S POOL MINEHEAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running St Michael's swimming pool and raising funds to support pool initiatives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
Governance
- 29 November 2007: Standard registration
- ST MICHAEL'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND FIRST SCHOOL P T A (Previous name)
- ST MICHAEL'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND FIRST SCHOOL, MINEHEAD P T A (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benet Allen | Chair | 27 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Gilbert | Trustee | 27 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Livingstone-Stallard | Trustee | 27 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Short | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Hewlett | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Sarah Butterworth | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.36k | £21.04k | £35.00k | £42.54k | £62.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.49k | £19.46k | £40.28k | £38.91k | £52.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 February 2023 | 243 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 October 2022 | 462 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 OCTOBER 2007 AS AMENDED 2 NOVEMBER 2007 as amended on 27 Aug 2024 as amended on 27 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE MINEHEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Michaels First School
Watery Lane
MINEHEAD
TA24 5NY
- Phone:
- 07876 728896
- Email:
- info@stmichaelspool.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window