DUKE UK TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance Education; Support academic research and provision of Healthcare
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- United States
Governance
- 04 February 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annette Bothwell | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Carl Sholtz | Trustee | 03 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN D BAYER | Trustee | 17 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £434.70k | £1.59m | £593.62k | £517.55k | £288.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £446.07k | £1.44m | £758.67k | £495.21k | £315.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £1.58m | £586.09k | £506.97k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £11.74k | £7.53k | £10.59k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £1.43m | £752.37k | £492.91k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £2.88k | £1.32k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £1.43m | £751.05k | £492.91k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £8.18k | £6.30k | £2.30k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 03 June 2020 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 03 June 2020 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, AND SUPPORT ACADEMIC RESEARCH AND THE PROVISION OF HEALTHCARE, IN PARTICULAR BY AWARDING GRANTS TO DUKE UNIVERSITY IN DURHAM, NORTH CAROLINA, USA, TO SUPPORT THE EDUCATION, ACADEMIC RESEARCH AND HEALTHCARE EFFORTS UNDERTAKEN BY THAT NON-PROFIT CHARITABLE INSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
DUKE UNIVERSITY IN DURHAM, NORTH CAROLINA, USA
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 NORCOTT ROAD
LONDON
N16 7EJ
- Phone:
- 02075022813
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window