MEDICAL AID FILMS LIMITED

Charity number: 1121578
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £678.04k £559.01k £510.73k £444.14k £681.94k
Total expenditure £676.88k £530.93k £506.30k £512.78k £642.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £327.66k £347.08k £262.41k N/A £193.68k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £350.11k £210.43k £247.65k N/A £487.37k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £86 £0 £357 N/A £179
Income - Other £179 £1.50k £314 N/A £719
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £609.14k £394.24k £347.61k N/A £549.86k
Expenditure - Raising funds £67.74k £136.70k £158.69k N/A £92.45k
Expenditure - Governance £10.96k £18.11k £14.56k N/A £13.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0