THE POETRY TRANSLATION CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1123056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £180.71k £153.88k £179.94k £139.61k £230.61k
Total expenditure £215.97k £182.78k £166.31k £177.06k £244.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £137.54k £124.58k £156.57k N/A £183.83k