Accounts and annual returns BOWLING GREEN SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1123708
Charity reporting is overdue by 356 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 356 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 356 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 09 September 2022 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 July 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 10 January 2020 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required