Financial history BOWLING GREEN SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1123708
Charity reporting is overdue by 359 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £22.39k £5.09k £4.23k £2.51k £717
Total expenditure £18.02k £8.46k £3.90k £2.92k £2.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A