SAHAN SOCIETY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1122826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £5.27k £3.48k £9.99k £5.02k £1.44k
Total expenditure £5.91k £5.50k £5.23k £3.12k £813
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A