Financial history ASSYRIAN CHURCH OF THE EAST RELIEF ORGANIZATION

Charity number: 1122343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £25.42k £427 £17.14k £68.44k £169.24k
Total expenditure £32.92k £59.67k £27.17k £48.54k £384.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A