Accounts and annual returns YR HEN YSGOL DINAS

Charity number: 1122445
Charity reporting is overdue by 32 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window