Financial history YR HEN YSGOL DINAS

Charity number: 1122445
Charity reporting is overdue by 80 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £43.10k £69.50k £17.51k £28.17k £69.42k
Total expenditure £39.24k £24.56k £16.44k £6.45k £13.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £40.65k N/A £23.77k N/A