GLOWCOIN LTD

Charity number: 1121632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £20.00k £19.00k £30.12k £5.00k £5.00k
Total expenditure £33.99k £15.50k £19.89k £12.28k £7.92k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A