CIS'TERS - SURVIVING RAPE AND SEXUAL ABUSE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE HOST A TWICE MONTHLY SUPPORT GROUP, AN ANNUAL WEEKEND WORKSHOP FOR SURVIVORS, RUN A NATIONAL HELPLINE, ORGANISE WORKSHOPS ACCESSIBLE TO WOMEN WHO WERE RAPED AND/OR SEXUALLY ABUSED AS GIRLS, PRODUCE A QUARTERLY NEWSLETTER & PROVIDE TRAINING FOR VOLUNTEERS. WE RUN MULTI-DISCIPLINARY AWARENESS RAISING TRAINING, WORKSHOPS, CONFERENCES AND SEMINARS FOR PROFESSIONALS AND AGENCIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Total income includes £1,358 from 1 government contract(s) and £11,000 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 March 2008: Standard registration
- 03 February 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 03 February 2021: Funds transferred to 1184857 CIS'TERS - SURVIVING RAPE AND SEXUAL ABUSE IN CHIL...
- CIS'TERS (CHILDHOOD INCEST SURVIVORS) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.37k | £41.54k | £60.19k | £56.06k | £64.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.73k | £46.22k | £54.04k | £47.98k | £55.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.00k | £3.14k | £3.87k | N/A | £1.36k | |
|
Income from government grants | £34.87k | £6.50k | £20.20k | £23.50k | £11.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 28 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 28 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 13 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 13 January 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10/02/2006 AS AMENDED ON 01/03/2008 AS AMENDED ON 09/10/2011
Charitable objects
1 TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND/OR PHYSICAL ASPECTS ADULT FEMALE SURVIVORS WHO HAVE BEEN SEXUALLY ABUSED DURING CHILDHOOD BY A MEMBER OF OR MEMBER OF THEIR EXTENDED FAMILY AND TO EMPOWER SUCH SURVIVORS IN THEIR OWN PERSONAL HEALING THROUGH THE MUTUAL AFFIRMATION, ACCEPTANCE, RESPECT AND SUPPORT OF OTHER SURVIVORS. 2 TO PROVIDE, DEPENDING ON THE AVAILABILITY OF SUSTAINABLE FUNDING, OR TO ASSIST WITH THE DEVELOPMENT/PROVISION OF SIMILARLY EMPOWERING SERVICES FOR THE FOLLOWING: A) ADULT FEMALE SURVIVORS OF CHILDHOOD SEXUAL ABUSE, THOUGH NOT WITHIN A FAMILIAL SETTING; B) ADULT MALE SURVIVORS OF CHILDHOOD SEXUAL ABUSE; C) CHILD VICTIMS OF SEXUAL ABUSE; D) NO ABUSING PARENT/GUARDIAN/CARER OF SURVIVORS OF SEXUAL ABUSE DURING CHILDHOOD; E) PARTNERS OF ADULT SURVIVORS OF CHILDHOOD SEXUAL ABUSE; F) CHILDREN OF ADULT SURVIVORS OF CHILDHOOD SEXUAL ABUSE 3 TO ADVANCE AT A LOCAL, REGIONAL AND NATIONAL LEVEL THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND/OR OTHER SPECIALIST SERVICES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY INCREASING AWARENESS OF THE IMPACT ON CHILD/ADULT SURVIVORS OF CHILDHOOD SEXUAL ABUSE AND THE ASSOCIATED COPING STRATEGIES USED BY SOME VICTIMS; AND TO PROMOTE AN IMPROVED SERVICE RESPONSE TO MEET THE UNMET NEEDS OF SUCH CHILD/ADULT SURVIVORS, AND OTHERS AFFECTED INDIRECTLY BY SUCH ABUSE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window