FOREST OF AVON TRUST

Charity number: 1122314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £153.93k £369.15k £180.26k £149.61k £263.78k
Total expenditure £142.26k £223.40k £176.21k £156.65k £183.13k
Income from government contracts £18.85k £1.25k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.65k £22.38k £42.01k £29.60k £33.90k