CARIS CAMDEN

Charity number: 1121919
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £219.05k £218.68k £250.79k £383.75k £437.59k
Total expenditure £153.67k £192.55k £228.58k £307.83k £344.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A