THE DONALD GORDON THIRD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1122870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 09 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 18 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 11 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 08 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2016 11 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2016 Not Required