CALVARY CHAPEL EAST DULWICH LIMITED

Charity number: 1122053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £23.04k £15.18k £17.05k
Total expenditure £13 £435 £14.62k £15.03k £16.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A