Governing document Learning Skills Research Foundation Limited
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/10/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/05/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25/08/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26/09/2012 as amended on 27 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF ACADEMIC RESEARCH WITHIN THE FIELDS OF NEUROSCIENCE AND PSYCHOLOGY, IN ORDER TO AFFORD TEACHERS, PARENTS AND OTHERS, A BETTER UNDERSTANDING OF THE LEARNING PROCESS AND IN ORDER TO DEVELOP NEW LEARNING SKILLS FOR APPLICATION TO THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS, INCLUDING THOSE WITH SPECIAL NEEDS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.