BAMESSILAH UK

Charity number: 1122372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 12 August 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 12 August 2020 379 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 06 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 03 September 2017 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 21 September 2016 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required