Financial history EUROPEAN SOCIETY OF ENDOCRINOLOGY

Charity number: 1123492
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.95m £3.92m £3.84m £2.45m £3.31m
Total expenditure £3.25m £3.92m £3.78m £2.47m £2.46m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £313.44k £642.42k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.63m £3.24m £3.80m £2.40m £3.26m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £37.31k £46.63k £44.85k £46.22k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.18m £3.75m £3.63m £2.35m £2.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.60k £20.98k £18.15k £21.72k £23.07k
Expenditure - Governance £299.25k £0 £455.46k £369.55k £350.77k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £3.60k £0 £18.15k £21.72k £23.07k
Expenditure - Other £64.01k £143.81k £129.37k £99.14k £126.90k