Accounts and annual returns HEART TO HELP

Charity number: 1122658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 04 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window