Trustees HEART TO HELP
Charity number: 1122658

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Lee Pattinson | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Edward Alan Bell | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|||||
LEE ANN DE VILLIERS | Trustee | 09 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN NIBLOCK | Trustee | 28 October 2006 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINE CLARK | Trustee | 23 June 1997 |
|
|||||
RANJIT ABRAHAM SINGH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.