Accounts and annual returns CLAPP FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1121944
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 October 2020 26 August 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 October 2020 26 August 2021 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 25 October 2019 20 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 October 2019 20 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 25 October 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 October 2018 24 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 25 October 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 October 2017 25 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 25 October 2016 22 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 October 2016 22 November 2016 On time Download Open in new window