Financial history CLAPP FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1121944
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 25/10/2016 25/10/2017 25/10/2018 25/10/2019 25/10/2020
Total gross income £68.55k £65.87k £65.93k £39.38k £28.35k
Total expenditure £61.46k £67.89k £61.53k £67.79k £68.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A