YOUTH WITH A MISSION, BOLIVIA

Charity number: 1123937
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £143.91k £106.15k £58.61k £128.33k £136.20k
Total expenditure £116.07k £158.16k £52.12k £132.12k £136.61k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A