RIVERSIDE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing riding to people of all ages with disabilities to improve their general health, well being and self esteem
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 03 January 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Isabelle Dray | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Booth | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alycia Dray | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Keogh | Trustee | 19 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Emma Smith | Trustee | 19 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Armstrong | Trustee | 19 August 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.84k | £26.07k | £14.11k | £15.55k | £11.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.82k | £26.42k | £15.42k | £11.05k | £11.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 06 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 06 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 23 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING (COMPANY NO 5010395) A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("THE COMPANY") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING IN THE BINGLEY AREA
Area of benefit
BINGLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
RAVEN ROYD FARM
RIVERSIDE
BINGLEY
BD16 2DL
- Phone:
- 07983879304
- Email:
- riversidepink@googlemail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window