CHILDREN'S ACUTE TRANSPORT SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the service is to improve and standardise care for the critically ill child requiring intensive care. The CATS Charity was set up to raise funds to support the needs of our service and ensure that we can, along with our NHS funding provide the best equipment and care suitable for the transport environment. This includes supporting our staffs education, training and well-being.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 08 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Sturgess | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARK ANTHONY CLEMENT | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr PADMANABHAN RAMNARAYAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr DANIEL HENRY LUTMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNN SHIELDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.28k | £12.86k | £30.04k | £83.96k | £38.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.55k | £11.33k | £29.14k | £39.49k | £38.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED 1 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF CRITICALLY ILL OR INJURED CHILDREN BY: - 1) THE PROVISION OF SERVICES TO TRANSFER THEM TO APPROPRIATE FACILITIES; AND 2. TO PROMOTE BEST PRACTICE IN THE STABILISATION AND TRANSPORT; AND 3. ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF ALL STAFF WITHIN THE CATS TEAM AND AT THE LOCAL HOSPITAL INVOLVED IN THEIR CARE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ground Floor Ormond House
26-27 Boswell Street
London
WC1N 3JZ
- Phone:
- 02074305850
- Email:
- queries@cats.nhs.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window