MOISHE BAMBERGER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1122999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £141.90k £96.64k £9.39k £72.17k £25
Total expenditure £105.50k £125.48k £16.31k £5.46k £72.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A